This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 11/30/2022 at 18:20:50 (UTC).

APEX ROOFING & RESTORATION LLC VS ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2022 APEX ROOFING RESTORATION LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

APEX ROOFING & RESTORATION LLC

Defendant

ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASAAD, MAJD

Defendant Attorney

GILSON, ALI

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/28/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REPORT- CASE MANAGEMENT

9/28/2022: REPORT- CASE MANAGEMENT

NOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

9/28/2022: NOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

9/28/2022: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

9/28/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

9/28/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

9/28/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE- INTERROGATORIES

9/28/2022: NOTICE- INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

9/28/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

9/28/2022: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022087614

10/1/2022: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022087614

SUMMONS SERVED - ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/10/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

10/17/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

10/27/2022: MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

MOTION - FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

11/23/2022: MOTION - FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $310.00; Amount Paid: $310.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - COUNTY; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022087614

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP- ISSUED 10/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPORT- CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APEX ROOFING AND RESTORATION LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR HAZLEY, CLARK AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR HAZLEY, DEBBIE is a litigant

Latest cases where ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gilson, Ali Isenberg, ESQ.