This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 12/18/2021 at 18:30:38 (UTC).

APEX ROOFING AND RESTORATION LLC VS LIGHTHOUSE PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 APEX ROOFING AND RESTORATION LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LIGHTHOUSE PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

APEX ROOFING AND RESTORATION LLC

Defendant

LIGHTHOUSE PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALEZ, ROBERT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/22/2021: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

11/22/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

11/22/2021: NOTICE - SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/22/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021099923

11/24/2021: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021099923

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

11/29/2021: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - LIGHTHOUSE PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION - ISSUED 12/13/2021

12/1/2021: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - LIGHTHOUSE PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION - ISSUED 12/13/2021

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021103723

12/8/2021: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021103723

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 7A; Description:CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021103723

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - LIGHTHOUSE PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION - ISSUED 12/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 04/22/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN 7A , JDG: MCHUGH, ANDREA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$410.00; Amount Paid:$410.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021099923

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APEX ROOFING AND RESTORATION LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR HAZLEY, CLARK AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR HAZLEY, DEBBIE is a litigant

Latest cases where Lighthouse Property Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALEZ , ROBERT