This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/23/2023 at 01:06:45 (UTC).

ANGELOS ITALIAN MARKET INC VS CAPACITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 ANGELOS ITALIAN MARKET INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CAPACITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANGELOS ITALIAN MARKET INC

Defendant

CAPACITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEMERSCROWELL, KRISTIN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/10/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

9/10/2022: COMPLAINT

PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022082445

9/12/2022: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022082445

ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

9/19/2022: ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

MOTION - FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT

2/21/2023: MOTION - FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

2/21/2023: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

2/21/2023: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023016142

2/21/2023: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023016142

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 7C; Description: CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023016142

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 02/21/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN 7C , JDG: WALKER, STEPHEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $410.00; Amount Paid: $410.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT; Total Fee: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022082445

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less