This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 13:43:37 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS ROSENBERG, YIDEL

Case Summary

On 04/13/2018 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROSENBERG, YIDEL. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 SC

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

ROSENBERG, YIDEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODLIN, SCOTT

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - YIDEL ROSENBERG

1/13/2020: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - YIDEL ROSENBERG

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - YIDEL ROSENBERG

1/13/2020: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - YIDEL ROSENBERG

DEFAULT JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018154443)

11/27/2018: DEFAULT JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018154443)

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

10/26/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE OF HEARING

9/7/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

8/22/2018: AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

MOTION - JUDICIAL DEFAULT & DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

8/22/2018: MOTION - JUDICIAL DEFAULT & DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

SUMMONS SERVED - YIDEL ROSENBERG

6/18/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - YIDEL ROSENBERG

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018038808

4/13/2018: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018038808

RECEIPT OF CORRESPONDENCE FROM JUDGE

1/17/2020: RECEIPT OF CORRESPONDENCE FROM JUDGE

NOTICE OF SERVICE - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND PRODUCTION REQUEST

12/5/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND PRODUCTION REQUEST

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

11/27/2018: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

11/27/2018: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC (NO NAME OF SENDER)

9/13/2018: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC (NO NAME OF SENDER)

NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

9/12/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

ANSWER - Y. ROSENBERG (PRO-SE)

6/18/2018: ANSWER - Y. ROSENBERG (PRO-SE)

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - YIDEL ROSENBERG- ISSUED 4/13/2018

4/13/2018: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - YIDEL ROSENBERG- ISSUED 4/13/2018

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/13/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT OF CORRESPONDENCE FROM JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketACTION: FORWARDED TWO CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - YIDEL ROSENBERG TO JUDGE RUHL FOR REVIEW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - YIDEL ROSENBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - YIDEL ROSENBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND PRODUCTION REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • HearingTime:09:45 AM; Location:COURTROOM H; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2018154443)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - JUDICIAL DEFAULT & DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - Y. ROSENBERG (PRO-SE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - YIDEL ROSENBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2018038808

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - YIDEL ROSENBERG- ISSUED 4/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less