This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 03:45:55 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS LUCEY JR, RAYMOND J

Case Summary

On 06/30/2017 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LUCEY JR, RAYMOND J. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N. and MOSS, DANA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SC

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

MOSS, DANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

LUCEY JR, RAYMOND J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOWARD, CHRISTINA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

1/16/2020: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT

5/2/2019: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT

5/2/2019: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT - COSTS BY PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY

5/2/2019: AFFIDAVIT - COSTS BY PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY

MOTION - SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

5/2/2019: MOTION - SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES PC

1/7/2019: CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES PC

ORDER - GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CHANGE CASE STYLE TO NAME AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AS PLAINTIFF

1/7/2019: ORDER - GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CHANGE CASE STYLE TO NAME AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AS PLAINTIFF

MOTION- CHANGE CASE STYLE

12/17/2018: MOTION- CHANGE CASE STYLE

NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/17/2018: NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/17/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

SUMMONS SERVED - RAYMOND J LUCEY JR 433 E SHADE DR VENICE FL. 34293, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE: KEITH TAYLOR - CORESIDENT

7/19/2017: SUMMONS SERVED - RAYMOND J LUCEY JR 433 E SHADE DR VENICE FL. 34293, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE: KEITH TAYLOR - CORESIDENT

RESPONSE - RAYMOND LUCEY

7/18/2017: RESPONSE - RAYMOND LUCEY

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017063431

6/30/2017: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017063431

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-RAYMOND J LUCEY JR - ISSUED 06/30/2017

6/30/2017: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-RAYMOND J LUCEY JR - ISSUED 06/30/2017

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/30/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

6/30/2017: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - COSTS BY PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES PC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CHANGE CASE STYLE TO NAME AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AS PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- CHANGE CASE STYLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - RAYMOND J LUCEY JR 433 E SHADE DR VENICE FL. 34293, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE: KEITH TAYLOR - CORESIDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - RAYMOND LUCEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017063431

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-RAYMOND J LUCEY JR - ISSUED 06/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less