This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/12/2023 at 18:13:24 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS DR JAMEY HANLEY Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DR JAMEY HANLEY. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

DR JAMEY HANLEY

HANLEY, WILLIAM

North Venice, FL 34275

HANLEY, WILLIAM J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZOGG, ERIK

BLANCO, ASHLEY

Defendant Attorney

KIDWELL, KELLYN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/11/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

1/11/2023: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

1/11/2023: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - WILLIAM HANLEY AKA WILLIAM J HANLEY AKA DR JAMEY HANLEY

1/11/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - WILLIAM HANLEY AKA WILLIAM J HANLEY AKA DR JAMEY HANLEY

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023003297

1/11/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023003297

ANSWER - WILLIAM HANLEY AKA WILLIAM J HANLEY AKA DR JAMEY HANLEY

2/15/2023: ANSWER - WILLIAM HANLEY AKA WILLIAM J HANLEY AKA DR JAMEY HANLEY

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

2/15/2023: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

SUMMONS NON SERVED - WILLIAM HANLEY AKA WILLIAM J HANLEY AKA DR JAMEY HANLEY

2/22/2023: SUMMONS NON SERVED - WILLIAM HANLEY AKA WILLIAM J HANLEY AKA DR JAMEY HANLEY

MOTION - TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

2/22/2023: MOTION - TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED - WILLIAM HANLEY AKA WILLIAM J HANLEY AKA DR JAMEY HANLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • HearingTime: 10:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM E; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - WILLIAM HANLEY AKA WILLIAM J HANLEY AKA DR JAMEY HANLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $310.00; Amount Paid: $310.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023003297

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - WILLIAM HANLEY AKA WILLIAM J HANLEY AKA DR JAMEY HANLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS (SOUTH COUNTY) SET FOR 02/15/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN F , JDG: BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500 (SOUTH COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less