This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/21/2021 at 10:02:56 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, HOUCHIN, DONNA C Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, HOUCHIN, DONNA C was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MOSS, DANA and QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MOSS, DANA

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

HOUCHIN, DONNA C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODLIN, SCOTT

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019045975

5/7/2019: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019045975

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

5/7/2019: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DONNA C HOUCHIN - ISSUED 5/7/19

5/7/2019: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DONNA C HOUCHIN - ISSUED 5/7/19

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/7/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

11/13/2020: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - GARNISHMENT

4/9/2020: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - GARNISHMENT

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - GARNISHMENT

4/9/2020: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - GARNISHMENT

WRIT RETURNED - GARNISHMENT - SERVED - CITIBANK NA

3/23/2020: WRIT RETURNED - GARNISHMENT - SERVED - CITIBANK NA

WRIT PROPOSED

3/4/2020: WRIT PROPOSED

MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY

3/4/2020: MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY

MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY

3/4/2020: MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY

NOTICE OF SERVICE - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS INTERROGATORIES AND PRODUCTION REQUEST

12/6/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS INTERROGATORIES AND PRODUCTION REQUEST

ORDER - GRANTING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/26/2019: ORDER - GRANTING FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT - SUMMARY FINAL - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019163546)

11/26/2019: JUDGMENT - SUMMARY FINAL - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019163546)

AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

10/10/2019: AFFIDAVIT - COSTS

MOTION- SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

10/10/2019: MOTION- SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

ANSWER - DONNA C HOUCHIN

6/24/2019: ANSWER - DONNA C HOUCHIN

SUMMONS SERVED - DONNA C HOUCHIN

6/10/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - DONNA C HOUCHIN

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL - GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL - GARNISHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketACTION: COPY OF CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - GARNISHMENT - AND REQUEST FOR HEARING FORWARDED TO JUDGE QUARTERMAINE FOR REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLAIM OF EXEMPTION - GARNISHMENT - REQUEST FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE ATTORNEY FEE DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED - GARNISHMENT - SERVED - CITIBANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - FIRST TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED- JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA MAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED- CITIBANK NA MAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER - DONNA C HOUCHIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - DONNA C HOUCHIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$480.00; Amount Paid:$480.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019045975

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - DONNA C HOUCHIN - ISSUED 5/7/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less