This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 03/15/2022 at 18:09:22 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB VS DEMARION, ROSALIA

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DEMARION, ROSALIA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 SC

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB

Defendant

DEMARION, ROSALIA

North Port, FL 34288

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODLIN, SCOTT

Defendant Attorney

HARWELL, HEATHER ADAIR

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/14/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

1/14/2022: NOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ROSALIA DEMARION

1/14/2022: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ROSALIA DEMARION

COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

1/14/2022: COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022004219

1/14/2022: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022004219

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

2/14/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS SERVED - ROSALIA DEMARION

2/17/2022: SUMMONS SERVED - ROSALIA DEMARION

ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL- AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND AVOIDANCES - ROSALIA DEMARION

2/21/2022: ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL- AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND AVOIDANCES - ROSALIA DEMARION

NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATOIRES

2/21/2022: NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATOIRES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

2/21/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

MOTION - TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

2/23/2022: MOTION - TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION - TO STRIKE AND INTERROGATORIES AND OBJECTIONS

3/14/2022: MOTION - TO STRIKE AND INTERROGATORIES AND OBJECTIONS

AFFIDAVIT - OF INDEBTEDNESS - NOTICE OF FILING

3/14/2022: AFFIDAVIT - OF INDEBTEDNESS - NOTICE OF FILING

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - OF INDEBTEDNESS - NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO STRIKE AND INTERROGATORIES AND OBJECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATOIRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL- AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND AVOIDANCES - ROSALIA DEMARION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - ROSALIA DEMARION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022004219

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- ROSALIA DEMARION - ISSUED 01/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEATHER ADAIR HARWELL