This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/18/2020 at 22:39:13 (UTC).

AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST FBO TODD ANDERSON IRA, BONNER, BILLY Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST FBO TODD ANDERSON IRA, BONNER, BILLY was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RUHL, MARIA and WALKER, STEPHEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RUHL, MARIA

WALKER, STEPHEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RESIDENTIAL LAND ACQUISITIONS LLC

Defendants

BONNER, PATRICIA DYANN

OSIPOV, SERGEY

ROGERS, TANAE R

JACKSON, PATSY A

ELDER, THERESA F

TIEDT, ALICE C

THOMAS, EUPHEMIA

LUDEMANN, BRENDA

JACKSON, MARY E

CIRAS LLC

DOVGOROUKI, ELIVRA

DOVGOROUKI, VLADIMIR

LUDEMANN, RICHARD

AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST FBO TODD ANDERSON IRA

ROGERS JR, CARLYLE W

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC AS NOMINEE FOR MARKET STREET MORTGAGE CORPORATION

BONNER, BILLY

MARKET STREET MORTGAGE CORPORATION

DUNLAP, FLOYD

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENEDICT, ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

LANFORD, J

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - BRENDA LUDEMANN RICHARD LUDEMANN - AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST FBO TODD ANDERSON IRA

5/1/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - BRENDA LUDEMANN RICHARD LUDEMANN - AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST FBO TODD ANDERSON IRA

NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS SERVED - BRENDA LUDEMANNN AND RICHARD LUDEMANN

4/29/2019: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE - SUMMONS SERVED - BRENDA LUDEMANNN AND RICHARD LUDEMANN

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019026986

3/14/2019: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019026986

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MARY E JACKSON - ISSUED 03/13/2019

3/13/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MARY E JACKSON - ISSUED 03/13/2019

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST FBO TODD ANDERSON IRA - SUMMONS NOT ISSUED - INCORRECT CLERK NAME

3/13/2019: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST FBO TODD ANDERSON IRA - SUMMONS NOT ISSUED - INCORRECT CLERK NAME

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - VLADIMIR DOVGOROUKI - ISSUED 03/13/2019

3/13/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - VLADIMIR DOVGOROUKI - ISSUED 03/13/2019

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CIRAS LLC - ISSUED 03/13/2019

3/13/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CIRAS LLC - ISSUED 03/13/2019

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ALICE C TIEDT - ISSUED 03/13/2019

3/13/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ALICE C TIEDT - ISSUED 03/13/2019

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - EUPHEMIA THOMAS - ISSUED 03/13/2019

3/13/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - EUPHEMIA THOMAS - ISSUED 03/13/2019

NOTICE OF HEARING

1/27/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF

11/13/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF

MOTION - EX-PARTE FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM, GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

10/30/2019: MOTION - EX-PARTE FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM, GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION

10/18/2019: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION

8/30/2019: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION

AFFIDAVIT - MILITARY SERVICE

6/6/2019: AFFIDAVIT - MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT - MILITARY SERVICE

6/6/2019: AFFIDAVIT - MILITARY SERVICE

DEFAULT - PATSY A JACKSON

6/5/2019: DEFAULT - PATSY A JACKSON

MOTION FOR DEFAULT - PATSY A JACKSON

6/4/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT - PATSY A JACKSON

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • HearingTime:09:15 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • HearingTime:11:45 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Feb 19 2020 9:15AM JUDGE: WALKER, STEPHEN LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION - HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 7C; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jan 28 2020 11:45AM JUDGE: WALKER, STEPHEN LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION - OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PEGGY A BONNER - ISSUED 3/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PATRICIA DYANN BONNER -ISSUED 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ALICE C TIEDT - ISSUED 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - THERESA F ELDER - ISSUED 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - EUPHEMIA THOMAS - ISSUED 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - FLOYD DUNLAP - ISSUED 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019030926)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT REAL PROP $50,000 OR LESS

    Read MoreRead Less