This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 03/19/2020 at 05:47:49 (UTC).

AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST FBO ARMIDA SASTREPATTERSON IRA, ANGEL, JOEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST FBO ARMIDA SASTREPATTERSON IRA, ANGEL, JOEL was filed as a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAGGERTY, DENICE

Defendants

COLONIAL BANK NA N/K/A BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST

SALAMANCA, GUSTAVO

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF GUSTAVO SALAMANCA

SARASOTA COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOEL ANGEL

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL VRIGNON

ANGEL, JOEL

FOX, ROGER A

PA RENTALS LLC

DANIELS, MOLLIE A

ROCK IT HOMES LLC

VRIGNON, MICHAEL

GREENBAUM, CRAIG ALLEN

SARASOTA PRESERVATION SOCIETY INC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CRAIG ALLEN GREENBAUM

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARGARITA BONILLA

AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST FBO ARMIDA SASTREPATTERSON IRA

SASTREPATTERSON, ARMIDA

BONILLA, MARGARITA

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVENS, ADAM

Defendant Attorney

KAYAN, BORA

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - COUNT X - Recorded (OR. / 2019085053)

6/25/2019: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - COUNT X - Recorded (OR. / 2019085053)

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - COUNT VI - Recorded (OR. / 2019085052)

6/25/2019: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - COUNT VI - Recorded (OR. / 2019085052)

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - COUNT V - Recorded (OR. / 2019085051)

6/25/2019: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - COUNT V - Recorded (OR. / 2019085051)

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - COUNT IV - Recorded (OR. / 2019085050)

6/25/2019: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - COUNT IV - Recorded (OR. / 2019085050)

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - COUNT III - Recorded (OR. / 2019085047)

6/25/2019: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - COUNT III - Recorded (OR. / 2019085047)

DEFAULT - PA RENTALS LLC - ROCK IT HOMES LLC - CRAIG ALLEN GREENBAUM - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CRAIG ALLEN GREENBAUM - MICHAEL VIRGNON - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL VRIGNON - MOLLIE A DANIELS - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MOLLIE A DANIELS

6/5/2019: DEFAULT - PA RENTALS LLC - ROCK IT HOMES LLC - CRAIG ALLEN GREENBAUM - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CRAIG ALLEN GREENBAUM - MICHAEL VIRGNON - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL VRIGNON - MOLLIE A DANIELS - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MOLLIE A DANIELS

MOTION - FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT - AS TO COUNT X

6/4/2019: MOTION - FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT - AS TO COUNT X

MOTION - FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT - AS TO COUNT VI

6/4/2019: MOTION - FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT - AS TO COUNT VI

MOTION - FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT - AS TO COUNT V

6/4/2019: MOTION - FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT - AS TO COUNT V

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MARGARITA BONILLA - ISSUED 01/11/2019

1/10/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MARGARITA BONILLA - ISSUED 01/11/2019

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOEL ANGEL - ISSUED 01/11/2019

1/10/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOEL ANGEL - ISSUED 01/11/2019

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CRAIG ALLEN GREENBAUM - ISSUED 01/11/2019

1/10/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CRAIG ALLEN GREENBAUM - ISSUED 01/11/2019

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - COLONIAL BANK - ISSUED 01/11/2019

1/10/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - COLONIAL BANK - ISSUED 01/11/2019

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ARMIDA SASTRE PATTERSON - ISSUED 01/11/2019

1/10/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ARMIDA SASTRE PATTERSON - ISSUED 01/11/2019

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST - ISSUED 01/11/2019

1/10/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST - ISSUED 01/11/2019

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ROGER A FOX - ISSUED 01/11/2019

1/10/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ROGER A FOX - ISSUED 01/11/2019

COMPLAINT REAL PROP $50,000 OR LESS

1/10/2019: COMPLAINT REAL PROP $50,000 OR LESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/10/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - COUNT X - Recorded (OR. / 2019085053)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - COUNT VI - Recorded (OR. / 2019085052)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - COUNT V - Recorded (OR. / 2019085051)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - COUNT IV - Recorded (OR. / 2019085050)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - COUNT III - Recorded (OR. / 2019085047)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT - PA RENTALS LLC - ROCK IT HOMES LLC - CRAIG ALLEN GREENBAUM - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CRAIG ALLEN GREENBAUM - MICHAEL VIRGNON - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MICHAEL VRIGNON - MOLLIE A DANIELS - UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MOLLIE A DANIELS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT - AS TO COUNT X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT - AS TO COUNT VI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT - AS TO COUNT V

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT - AS TO COUNT IV

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MICHAEL VRIGNON - ISSUED 01/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MARGARITA BONILLA - ISSUED 01/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - JOEL ANGEL - ISSUED 01/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CRAIG ALLEN GREENBAUM - ISSUED 01/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - COLONIAL BANK - ISSUED 01/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ARMIDA SASTRE PATTERSON - ISSUED 01/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AMERICAN ESTATE AND TRUST - ISSUED 01/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ROGER A FOX - ISSUED 01/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT REAL PROP $50,000 OR LESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less