This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 01/02/2023 at 20:02:42 (UTC).

AMERICAN DRILLING OF SARASOTA, INC. VS CLAYTON HOMES 696 Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2019 AMERICAN DRILLING OF SARASOTA, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CLAYTON HOMES 696. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN DRILLING OF SARASOTA INC

Defendant

CMH HOMES INC D/B/A CLAYTON HOMES 696 A/K/A CHM OF FL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREGG MARTIN HOROWITZ

Defendant Attorney

HOWANITZ, E

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT - CMH HOMES INC D/B/A CLAYTON HOMES 696 A/K/A CHM OF FL INC

10/8/2019: DEFAULT - CMH HOMES INC D/B/A CLAYTON HOMES 696 A/K/A CHM OF FL INC

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/6/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - GARNISHMENT

3/30/2020: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL - GARNISHMENT

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

5/19/2020: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

WRIT PROPOSED

2/21/2020: WRIT PROPOSED

SUMMONS- PROPOSED

9/6/2019: SUMMONS- PROPOSED

AFFIDAVIT - SONDRA RODRIGUEZ

1/15/2020: AFFIDAVIT - SONDRA RODRIGUEZ

NOTICE - IN ACCORDANCE WITH GARNISHMENT STATUTE

3/12/2020: NOTICE - IN ACCORDANCE WITH GARNISHMENT STATUTE

RESPONSE - IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY FEE AND COSTS

12/5/2019: RESPONSE - IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY FEE AND COSTS

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL - GARNISHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - IN ACCORDANCE WITH GARNISHMENT STATUTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE - TRUIST BANK AS SUCESSOR BY MERGER TO SUN TRUST BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED - SERVED - SUNTRUST BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - GARNISHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED - GARNISHMENT - SUNTRUST BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2020018921

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT PROPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - CMH HOMES INC D/B/A CLAYTON HOMES 696 A/K/A CHM OF FL INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - CMH HOMES, INC D/B/A CLAYTON HOMES 696 A/K/A CHM OF FL, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $395.00; Amount Paid: $395.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - COUNTY; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • FinancialFee Description: GARNISHMENT FILING FEE - COUNTY; Total Fee: $85.00; Amount Paid: $85.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019089299

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - CMH HOMES INC D/B/A CLAYTON HOMES 696 CHM OF FL INC - ISSUED 9/9/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less