This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/18/2020 at 19:48:56 (UTC).

ALLEN, JOHN, ALLEN, JOHN T Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 ALLEN, JOHN, ALLEN, JOHN T was filed as a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON TRUST NA SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE TO CITIBANK NA AS TRUSTEE

Defendants

UNKNOWN PARTY 3

ALLENWILLOUGHBY, CONSTANCE

ALLEN, JOHN T

UNKNOWN PARTY 4

ALLEN, JOHN

UNKNOWN PARTY 1

SOUTH GATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN PARTY 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARGER, RYAN

LINDHARDT, CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorneys

HOROWITZ, GREGG MARTIN

GREGG M. HOROWITZ PA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

5/28/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

OBJECTION - TO ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

5/9/2019: OBJECTION - TO ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

4/29/2019: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

DEFAULT - SOUTH GATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

4/9/2019: DEFAULT - SOUTH GATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - UNKNOWN PARTY #1, UNKNOWN PARTY # 2, UNKNOWN PARTY # 3, UNKNOWN PARTY # 4 - Recorded (OR. / 2019043727)

4/5/2019: NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED AND RECORDED - UNKNOWN PARTY #1, UNKNOWN PARTY # 2, UNKNOWN PARTY # 3, UNKNOWN PARTY # 4 - Recorded (OR. / 2019043727)

SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY #1

3/18/2019: SUMMONS NON SERVED - UNKNOWN PARTY #1

SUMMONS SERVED - SOUTH GATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC - CORPORATE SERVED

3/18/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - SOUTH GATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC - CORPORATE SERVED

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CONSTANCE ALLEN WILLOUGHBY - ISSUED 02/19/2019

2/19/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CONSTANCE ALLEN WILLOUGHBY - ISSUED 02/19/2019

COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

2/19/2019: COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

12/19/2019: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

SUMMONS ALIAS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SOUTH GATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC - ISSUED 11/26/2019

11/25/2019: SUMMONS ALIAS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - SOUTH GATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC - ISSUED 11/26/2019

RESPONSE - ADMISSSIONS

9/11/2019: RESPONSE - ADMISSSIONS

MOTION - TO DISMISS

9/11/2019: MOTION - TO DISMISS

ORDER - AGREED - IN MOTION FOR EXTENSION

8/12/2019: ORDER - AGREED - IN MOTION FOR EXTENSION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - HEARING

8/9/2019: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - HEARING

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - DEPOSITION

7/3/2019: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - DEPOSITION

MOTION - FOR EXTENSION

6/14/2019: MOTION - FOR EXTENSION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION- HEARING

6/7/2019: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION- HEARING

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • HearingTime:03:45 PM; Location:COURTROOM 6C; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • HearingTime:10:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6C; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Mar 11 2020 3:45PM JUDGE: MCHUGH, ANDREA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Mar 11 2020 3:45PM JUDGE: MCHUGH, ANDREA LOCATION: 6C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Mar 11 2020 10:00AM JUDGE: MCHUGH, ANDREA LOCATION: 6C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Mar 11 2020 10:00AM JUDGE: MCHUGH, ANDREA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $955.00 RECEIPT #2019017536

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN PARTY # 2 - ISSUED 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- UNKNOWN PARTY # 1 - ISSUED 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- JOHN ALLEN AKA JOHN T ALLEN - ISSUED 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- CONSTANCE ALLEN WILLOUGHBY - ISSUED 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE- SOUTH GATE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC -ISSUED 02/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- VALUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019019860)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99

    Read MoreRead Less