This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 04/24/2023 at 18:07:59 (UTC).

AIR QUALITY ASSESSORS OF FLORIDA Et Al VS AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 AIR QUALITY ASSESSORS OF FLORIDA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AIR QUALITY ASSESSORS OF FLORIDA

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNON, HANS

Defendant Attorneys

KOENER, KATHERINE

CIELL, KURT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/23/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

2/23/2023: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

2/23/2023: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

2/23/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE - INTERROGATORIES

2/23/2023: NOTICE - INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

2/23/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL AND COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516

2/23/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL AND COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516

NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

2/23/2023: NOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023017248

2/23/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023017248

SUMMONS SERVED - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

4/13/2023: SUMMONS SERVED - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

4/20/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

4/20/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

MOTION - TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW

4/21/2023: MOTION - TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $310.00; Amount Paid: $310.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - COUNTY; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023017248

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL AND COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA - ISSUED 2/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less