This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/18/2020 at 11:33:10 (UTC).

ACUITY PROFESSIONAL PLACEMENT SOLUTIONS LLC VS MESKIL, COREY Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2018 ACUITY PROFESSIONAL PLACEMENT SOLUTIONS LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against MESKIL, COREY. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCHUGH, ANDREA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCHUGH, ANDREA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

ACUITY PROFESSIONAL PLACEMENT SOLUTIONS LLC

Defendants, Counter Plaintiffs and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

STUMP, MCKENZIE

MESKIL, COREY

TOMASKO, PETE

3Rd Party Defendant

MCCAULEY, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SMITH, JOSHUA

BURGESS, JAMES H JR

Defendant Attorney

HERBERT, JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE - PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION

1/10/2020: RESPONSE - PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION

RESPONSE - PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSION

1/10/2020: RESPONSE - PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSION

NOTICE - OF SERVICE - RESPONSES INTERROGATORIES

1/10/2020: NOTICE - OF SERVICE - RESPONSES INTERROGATORIES

MOTION - TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM OF DEFENDANTS

1/6/2020: MOTION - TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM OF DEFENDANTS

LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

12/18/2019: LETTER - OUTSTANDING FEES

NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

10/4/2019: NOTICE - OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

CONSENT TO STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

7/24/2019: CONSENT TO STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

7/15/2019: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

SUMMONS SERVED - COREY MESKIL

12/20/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - COREY MESKIL

NOTICE OF HEARING

1/17/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF SERVICE - RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES

1/13/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE - RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT- COUNTER - CIRCUIT - AND THIRD-PARTY CLAIM AND ANSWER - MCKENZIE STUMP COREY MESKIL AND PETE TOMASKO

12/3/2019: COMPLAINT- COUNTER - CIRCUIT - AND THIRD-PARTY CLAIM AND ANSWER - MCKENZIE STUMP COREY MESKIL AND PETE TOMASKO

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - HEARING

11/19/2019: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - HEARING

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE - ON ALL DISCOVERY MOTIONS - ALL MOTIONS DIRECTED TO THE PLEADINGS AND ANY OTHER MOTIONS STIPULATED BY THE PARTIES

11/13/2019: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE - ON ALL DISCOVERY MOTIONS - ALL MOTIONS DIRECTED TO THE PLEADINGS AND ANY OTHER MOTIONS STIPULATED BY THE PARTIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/4/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ORDER - ON STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION

7/29/2019: ORDER - ON STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - EMAIL DESIGNATION

1/8/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - EMAIL DESIGNATION

SUMMONS SERVED - PETE TOMASKO

12/20/2018: SUMMONS SERVED - PETE TOMASKO

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • HearingTime:02:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM 1; Description:MOTIONS ;Court Result:CANCELLED BY JACS INTERFACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • HearingTime:02:00 PM; Location:COURTROOM 1; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO CONSOLIDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Feb 20 2020 2:00PM JUDGE: BAILEY, DEBORAH LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Docket*** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Feb 20 2020 2:30PM JUDGE: BAILEY, DEBORAH LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Feb 20 2020 2:30PM JUDGE: BAILEY, DEBORAH LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Feb 20 2020 2:00PM JUDGE: BAILEY, DEBORAH LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE - RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - PETE TOMASKO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - COREY MESKIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - MCKENZIE STUMP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$835.00; Amount Paid:$835.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2018117183

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - PETE TOMASKO- ISSUED 11/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - MCKENZIE STUMP- ISSUED 11/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - COREY MESKIL- ISSUED 11/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less