This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/19/2020 at 02:14:26 (UTC).

ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO SARASOTA COASTAL CREDIT UNION, ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE ABOVE NAMED DEFENDANT WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO SARASOTA COASTAL CREDIT UNION, ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE ABOVE NAMED DEFENDANT WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST was filed as a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CARROLL, HUNTER W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CARROLL, HUNTER W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2

KAENDLER, A

KAENDLER, HERMAN

KAENDLER, HERMANN

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER AND AGAINST THE ABOVE NAMED DEFENDANT WHO ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST AS SPOUSE HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS

KAENDLER, H

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1

ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO SARASOTA COASTAL CREDIT UNION

ANTHONY S LEFCO TRUSTEE OF THE ANTHONY S LEFCO LIVVING TRUST DATED JULY 10 2010 AS AMENDED

KAENDLER, ANDREA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TEBBI, MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

KIM, YOUNG

ORSILLO, STEPHEN

FITZGIBBONS, THOMAS MARTIN

 

Court Documents

MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

5/22/2019: MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

5/16/2019: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

ANSWER - ANTHONY S LEFCO TRUSTEE OF THE ANTHONY S LEFCO LIVING TRUST DATED JULY 10, 2010

5/7/2019: ANSWER - ANTHONY S LEFCO TRUSTEE OF THE ANTHONY S LEFCO LIVING TRUST DATED JULY 10, 2010

SUMMONS SERVED - ANTHONY S LEFCO TRUSTEE OF THE ANTHONY S LEFCO LIVING TRUST DATED JULY 10, 2010 AS AMENDED - SUBSTITUTE SERVED

5/7/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - ANTHONY S LEFCO TRUSTEE OF THE ANTHONY S LEFCO LIVING TRUST DATED JULY 10, 2010 AS AMENDED - SUBSTITUTE SERVED

SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2 - ISSUED 04/17/2019

4/17/2019: SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2 - ISSUED 04/17/2019

NOTICE - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

4/17/2019: NOTICE - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

LIS PENDENS-RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019049290)

4/17/2019: LIS PENDENS-RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019049290)

COMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

4/17/2019: COMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/17/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

1/21/2020: MOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE - SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/10/2020: NOTICE - SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

1/8/2020: ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

1/8/2020: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

NOTICE - SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/6/2019: NOTICE - SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER SETTING COURT DATE -AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/4/2019: ORDER SETTING COURT DATE -AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

RESPONSE - TO MOTION DISMISS OR STRIKE

9/27/2019: RESPONSE - TO MOTION DISMISS OR STRIKE

MOTION- DISMISS COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

9/9/2019: MOTION- DISMISS COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

NOTICE - SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

8/26/2019: NOTICE - SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6A; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6A; Description:ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - FIRST REQUEST ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Mar 11 2020 9:00AM JUDGE: CARROLL, HUNTER W LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 03/11/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 6A , JDG: CARROLL, HUNTER W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 6A; Description:MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2 - ISSUED 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1 - ISSUED 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ANTHONY S LEFCO TRUSTEE OF THE ANTHONY S LEIFCO LIVING TRUST - ISSUED 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - ANDREA KAENDLER AKA A KAENDLER -ISSUED 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - HERMANN KAENDLER AKA HERMAN KAENDLER - ISSUED 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS-RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019049290)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FORECLSE >$250,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less