This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 12/24/2022 at 01:13:30 (UTC).

ABSOLUTE MOBILE HOME ROOFING OF FLORIDA LLC Et Al VS BANNER, CHRISTOPHER Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2017 ABSOLUTE MOBILE HOME ROOFING OF FLORIDA LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BANNER, CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABSOLUTE MOBILE HOME ROOFING OF FLORIDA LLC

ABSOLUTE ROOFING OF FLORIDA

Defendants

HERRON CONSTRUCTION, L.L.C.

HUELSTER, KATHRINE

BANNER, CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DORMAN, LORI

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT - COUNTY

10/6/2017: COMPLAINT - COUNTY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/6/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

EXHIBIT

10/6/2017: EXHIBIT

LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017124052)

10/6/2017: LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017124052)

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-CHRISTOPHER BANNER - ISSUED 10/06/2017

10/6/2017: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-CHRISTOPHER BANNER - ISSUED 10/06/2017

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-KATHRINE HUELSTER - ISSUED 10/06/2017

10/6/2017: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-KATHRINE HUELSTER - ISSUED 10/06/2017

SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-HERRON CONSTRUCTION LLC - ISSUED 10/06/2017

10/6/2017: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-HERRON CONSTRUCTION LLC - ISSUED 10/06/2017

PAYMENT $330.00 RECEIPT #2017094500

10/6/2017: PAYMENT $330.00 RECEIPT #2017094500

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-VOLUNTARY

11/7/2017: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-VOLUNTARY

NOTICE OF FILING - STIPULATION - NOT ATTACHED

11/8/2017: NOTICE OF FILING - STIPULATION - NOT ATTACHED

STIPULATION - VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

11/8/2017: STIPULATION - VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - STIPULATION - NOT ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-VOLUNTARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $330.00; Amount Paid: $330.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • FinancialFee Description: COMPLAINT - COUNTY; Total Fee: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • FinancialFee Description: SUMMONS COUNTY SUBMITTED EFILE & ISSUED; Total Fee: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $330.00 RECEIPT #2017094500

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-HERRON CONSTRUCTION LLC - ISSUED 10/06/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-KATHRINE HUELSTER - ISSUED 10/06/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-CHRISTOPHER BANNER - ISSUED 10/06/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017124052)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERRON CONSTRUCTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LORI MARYL DORMAN