This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 02/19/2020 at 04:17:21 (UTC).

ABNER, ROBIN, CAVALRY SPV I LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 ABNER, ROBIN, CAVALRY SPV I LLC was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MOSS, DANA and QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MOSS, DANA

QUARTERMAINE, ERIKA N.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

ABNER, ROBIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT, DERYL

Defendant Attorney

DELEON, SHANA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED - ROBIN ABNER

5/13/2019: SUMMONS SERVED - ROBIN ABNER

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019045928

5/7/2019: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019045928

SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - ROBIN ABNER

5/7/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - ROBIN ABNER

SUMMONS- PROPOSED - ROBIN ABNER

5/6/2019: SUMMONS- PROPOSED - ROBIN ABNER

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

5/6/2019: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/6/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

5/6/2019: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020007275)

1/16/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020007275)

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

1/16/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

STIPULATION- SETTLEMENT

1/16/2020: STIPULATION- SETTLEMENT

AFFIDAVIT - SWORN - OF SHANA DELEON - IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

10/21/2019: AFFIDAVIT - SWORN - OF SHANA DELEON - IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

10/8/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

10/8/2019: ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8/9/2019: RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

STIPULATION- TO WAIVE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

8/9/2019: STIPULATION- TO WAIVE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

8/5/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

6/18/2019: COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

ORDER SETTING - PRETRIAL

6/18/2019: ORDER SETTING - PRETRIAL

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020007275)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION- SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - SWORN - OF SHANA DELEON - IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT - ROBIN ABNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2B; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2B; Description:PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 10/08/2019 AT 9:00 AM IN 2B , JDG: MOSS, DANA

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING - PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED - ROBIN ABNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$310.00; Amount Paid:$310.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019045928

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - COUNTY - ROBIN ABNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - SMALL CLAIMS SET FOR 06/18/2019 AT 9:00 AM IN 2B , JDG: MOSS, DANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- PROPOSED - ROBIN ABNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - >$2500

    Read MoreRead Less