Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 04/17/2021 at 19:03:42 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS WILLIAMS JR, JERMAINE FRANKLIN Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WILLIAMS JR, JERMAINE FRANKLIN. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

WILLIAMS, JERMAINE FRANKLIN

WILLIAMS JR, JERMAINE FRANKLIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

5/16/2021: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SSO 21-31481

5/16/2021: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SSO 21-31481

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

5/16/2021: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

4/16/2021: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

4/16/2021: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

4/16/2021: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SSO 21-31481

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 05/28/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A , JDG: CURLEY, ROCHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less