This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/03/2022 at 21:00:41 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS WIGGS, JAMES LEEWILBERT

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WIGGS, JAMES LEEWILBERT. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WIGGS, JAMES LEEWILBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VERES, PAUL

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

PROFFITT, GEOFFREY HARRISON

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

4/29/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#2236079

4/29/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#2236079

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

4/29/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

4/29/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

4/29/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

4/29/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

5/2/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 05/18/2022)

5/17/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 05/18/2022)

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

6/3/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3B; Description:CRIMINAL - CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 07/26/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 3B , JDG: CURLEY, ROCHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#2236079

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROFFITT, GEOFFREY HARRISON