This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/29/2022 at 21:02:06 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS WEIMER, NICO RAY

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WEIMER, NICO RAY. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WEIMER, NICO RAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

BAEZ, JOHN

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

6/24/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD#22-33642

6/24/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD#22-33642

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

6/24/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

6/24/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

6/24/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

6/24/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

7/1/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

7/1/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF006915NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF006915NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD#22-33642

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAEZ, JOHN