Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 17:00:53 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS TURNER JR, RICKY STEPHON

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TURNER JR, RICKY STEPHON. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOEHM, MARYANN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOEHM, MARYANN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

TURNER JR, RICKY STEPHON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WESTPHAL, STEVEN

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION

4/15/2021: INFORMATION

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

4/15/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

CITATION # ACME77E

4/2/2021: CITATION # ACME77E

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ACME77E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketADD SENT TO TCATS - ACME77E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION # ACME77E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 04/20/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 2A , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant