Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 05/07/2021 at 21:00:20 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS TRIVANE, ERIN

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TRIVANE, ERIN. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

TRIVANE, ERIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SATO, NICHOLAS

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 04/28/2021)

4/26/2021: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 04/28/2021)

NOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION/FILED ON/DECLINE

4/26/2021: NOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION/FILED ON/DECLINE

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

4/26/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

4/7/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

BOND - PAPER POWER #PSE5912514

4/6/2021: BOND - PAPER POWER #PSE5912514

BOND - PAPER POWER #PSE5912515

4/6/2021: BOND - PAPER POWER #PSE5912515

BOND - PAPER POWER #PSE5912423

4/6/2021: BOND - PAPER POWER #PSE5912423

BOND - PAPER POWER #PSE5912422

4/6/2021: BOND - PAPER POWER #PSE5912422

BOND - PAPER POWER #PSE5912421

4/6/2021: BOND - PAPER POWER #PSE5912421

ADVISORY HEARING CONTINUANCE

4/2/2021: ADVISORY HEARING CONTINUANCE

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT # 21-15398

4/2/2021: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT # 21-15398

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

4/2/2021: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 4A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION/FILED ON/DECLINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER #PSE5912514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER #PSE5912515

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER #PSE5912423

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER #PSE5912422

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER #PSE5912421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT # 21-15398

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SATO, NICHOLAS