This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/31/2022 at 21:01:08 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS ., TJ Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against , TJ. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

PHILONE, YVENS

., TJ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREINER, WILLIAM

Defendant Attorneys

PROFFITT, GEOFFREY HARRISON

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

7/27/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-37875

7/27/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-37875

WARRANT EXECUTED

7/27/2022: WARRANT EXECUTED

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

7/27/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

7/27/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

7/27/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

7/29/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

INFORMATION

8/24/2022: INFORMATION

WARRANT EXECUTED

8/25/2022: WARRANT EXECUTED

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

8/25/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

ADVISORY HEARING CONTINUANCE

8/25/2022: ADVISORY HEARING CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

8/26/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

NOTICE OF CASE ACTION

8/26/2022: NOTICE OF CASE ACTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

8/26/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

8/26/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 10/07/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 4A , JDG: KRUG, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketWARRANT # 222022004545 - CAPIAS (CRIMINAL) - ISSUED: CHARGE ONLY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketORDER - CAPIAS ISSUED- COUNTS 2 & 4 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-37875

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TJ is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROFFITT, GEOFFREY HARRISON