This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/31/2022 at 21:00:48 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS STEINMAN, JACOB JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against STEINMAN, JACOB JOSEPH. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CURLEY, ROCHELLE and KRUG, THOMAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

KRUG, THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

STEINMAN, JACOB JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEAF, MEGAN

Defendant Attorneys

BAEZ, JOHN

MCINTOSH, BRETT DONALD

OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

 

Court Documents

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD#22-43082

7/27/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD#22-43082

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

7/27/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

7/27/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

8/1/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

8/1/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

8/1/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

8/1/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

8/1/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

8/4/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY, AN DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

8/4/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY, AN DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

8/12/2022: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

ORDER SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

8/12/2022: ORDER SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

INFORMATION

8/19/2022: INFORMATION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 8/22/22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY, AN DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD#22-43082

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCINTOSH, BRETT DONALD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAEZ, JOHN