This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/31/2022 at 21:00:42 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SOSA, JORGE NICHOLAS

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SOSA, JORGE NICHOLAS. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SOSA, JORGE NICHOLAS

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

7/27/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-63107

7/27/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-63107

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

7/27/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

CASH 9076673A POSTED $1,500.00

8/1/2022: CASH 9076673A POSTED $1,500.00

CASH 9076673A POSTED $500.00

8/1/2022: CASH 9076673A POSTED $500.00

BOND - CASH NO 9076673A

8/1/2022: BOND - CASH NO 9076673A

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - CASH NO 9076673A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASH 9076673A POSTED $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASH 9076673A POSTED $1,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCASH BOND PAYMENT RECEIPT: 2022067823

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-63107

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant