This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 04/12/2022 at 21:14:28 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SNYDER, ALEXIS M

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SNYDER, ALEXIS M. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 SC

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SNYDER, ALEXIS M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

RIBEL, ZACHARY

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT CITATION

3/8/2022: COMPLAINT CITATION

DEFENDANT'S WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

3/9/2022: DEFENDANT'S WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

3/9/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

3/24/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM A; Description:CRIMINAL - PRE TRIALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - PRE TRIALS SET FOR 05/03/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN A , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 03/24/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN J , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZACHARY MARK RIBEL