This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/25/2022 at 21:01:11 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SHAVER, MICHAEL DANIEL

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SHAVER, MICHAEL DANIEL. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SHAVER, MICHAEL DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARGENT, KRISTINA

Defendant Attorneys

OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

BAEZ, JOHN

LOCKE, RETLEY

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

6/20/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - VPD#22-0811

6/20/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - VPD#22-0811

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

6/20/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

6/20/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

6/20/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

6/20/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PLEA DENYING OR NOT GUILTY

6/23/2022: PLEA DENYING OR NOT GUILTY

INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

6/23/2022: INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

PUBLIC DEFENDERS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

6/23/2022: PUBLIC DEFENDERS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

6/27/2022: ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

7/1/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

7/5/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

BOND - PAPER POWER NO. PSE151003421

7/5/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO. PSE151003421

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 07/12/2022)

7/11/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 07/12/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 07/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO. PSE151003421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDERS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA DENYING OR NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $50.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED (F.S. 27.52); Total Fee: $50.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF006790NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - VPD#22-0811

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 07/29/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A , JDG: PADAR, DONNA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOCKE, RETLEY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAEZ, JOHN