This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/08/2022 at 21:01:01 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SERRANO, DAVID ENRIQUE

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SERRANO, DAVID ENRIQUE. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

SERRANO, DAVID ENRIQUE

SERRANO, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEGEL, REBECCA

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

VELASQUEZ, ROSEMARIE

 

Court Documents

BOND - PAPER : POWER NUMBER CF5 - 70382426

4/4/2022: BOND - PAPER : POWER NUMBER CF5 - 70382426

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

4/4/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

CITATION - AEXE7LE

4/4/2022: CITATION - AEXE7LE

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD#22-018717

4/4/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD#22-018717

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

4/4/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

4/4/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

4/4/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

4/4/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

CITATION # AEXE7LE

4/5/2022: CITATION # AEXE7LE

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

4/5/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

ORDER REVOKING BOND AND REMANDED TO CUSTODY

4/11/2022: ORDER REVOKING BOND AND REMANDED TO CUSTODY

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 04/28/2022)

4/28/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 04/28/2022)

ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

5/6/2022: ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

APPEARANCE RECORD SUMMONS/ NOTICE

5/6/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD SUMMONS/ NOTICE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

5/6/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3B; Description:CRIMINAL - CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 07/05/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 3B , JDG: CURLEY, ROCHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD SUMMONS/ NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEXE7LE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketSURETY CF570382426 (322.34(2C)) REVOKED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketWARRANT # 222022001830 - CUSTODY ORDER - CURRENT STATUS: ACCEPTED

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketADD SENT TO TCATS - AEXE7LE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD#22-018717

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION - AEXE7LE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER : POWER NUMBER CF5 - 70382426

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VELASQUEZ, ROSEMARIE