This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/03/2022 at 21:01:19 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SCHURE, ALYSON FRANCIS

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SCHURE, ALYSON FRANCIS. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SCHURE, ALYSON FRANCIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

PROFFITT, GEOFFREY HARRISON

OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

BAEZ, JOHN

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

6/29/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #22-54851

6/29/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #22-54851

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

6/29/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

6/29/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

6/29/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

6/29/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

7/5/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

PUBLIC DEFENDERS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

7/18/2022: PUBLIC DEFENDERS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

7/19/2022: ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

7/20/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDERS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF007109NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF007109NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #22-54851

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAEZ, JOHN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROFFITT, GEOFFREY HARRISON