This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/25/2022 at 21:01:07 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SAVIGNE, FRANCISCO XAVIER

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SAVIGNE, FRANCISCO XAVIER. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SAVIGNE, FRANCISCO XAVIER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEGEL, REBECCA

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

1/21/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

BOND - PAPER 562659090-9

1/21/2022: BOND - PAPER 562659090-9

BOND - PAPER 562659089-7

1/21/2022: BOND - PAPER 562659089-7

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 2022-105222

1/21/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 2022-105222

WARRANT EXECUTED

1/21/2022: WARRANT EXECUTED

INFORMATION

1/27/2022: INFORMATION

ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

2/25/2022: ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

2/25/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED ON 1-28-2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 2022-105222

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER 562659089-7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER 562659090-9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEGEL, REBECCA