This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 08/05/2022 at 21:06:28 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SANCHEZBENAVIDES, IAN EDGARDO

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SANCHEZBENAVIDES, IAN EDGARDO. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SANCHEZBENAVIDES, IAN EDGARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

REYNOLDS, JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

CITATION AG5W33E

7/1/2022: CITATION AG5W33E

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY, WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

7/11/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY, WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

7/20/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

STATE RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND TO DISCOVERY

7/25/2022: STATE RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND TO DISCOVERY

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • HearingTime: 10:30 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2A; Description: CRIMINAL - PRE TRIALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE RESPONSE TO DEFENSE DEMAND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 2A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - PRE TRIALS SET FOR 08/16/2022 AT 10:30 AM IN 2A , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY, WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketADD SENT TO TCATS - AG5W33E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION AG5W33E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 07/20/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 2A , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REYNOLDS, JEFFREY