This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 09/14/2021 at 21:29:06 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SAMUELSON, KEVIN MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SAMUELSON, KEVIN MICHAEL. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENKIN, DAVID LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 SC

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENKIN, DAVID LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SAMUELSON, KEVIN MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MCPEEK, ALAN BRENT

 

Court Documents

CITATION # AEZPQ1E

8/10/2021: CITATION # AEZPQ1E

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, ENTRY OF CONDITIONAL PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/1/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, ENTRY OF CONDITIONAL PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS AND SECONDARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

9/1/2021: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS AND SECONDARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

9/1/2021: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

9/1/2021: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

WAIVER - APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERANCE

9/1/2021: WAIVER - APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERANCE

MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

9/1/2021: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE

9/1/2021: ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

9/2/2021: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:CRIMINAL - PRE TRIALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM J; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL - PRE TRIALS SET FOR 10/05/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN J , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO CONSOLIDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER - APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS AND SECONDARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, ENTRY OF CONDITIONAL PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketADD SENT TO TCATS - AEZPQ1E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 09/02/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN J , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION # AEZPQ1E

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCPEEK, ALAN BRENT