This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 05/05/2022 at 21:02:01 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SAMUELS, JAMIE ANDRE

Case Summary

On 03/31/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SAMUELS, JAMIE ANDRE. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SAMUELS, JAMIE ANDRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEGEL, REBECCA

Defendant Attorneys

LOCKE, RETLEY

PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

4/1/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

4/1/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

4/1/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

4/1/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

4/1/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

4/1/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL IN DISCOVERY

4/4/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL IN DISCOVERY

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 05/03/2022)

5/2/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 05/03/2022)

ACKNOWLEDGMENT WAIVER OF RIGHTS

5/5/2022: ACKNOWLEDGMENT WAIVER OF RIGHTS

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

5/5/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • HearingTime:01:30 PM; Location:COURTROOM ZOOM; Description:CRIMINAL - SENTENCING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT WAIVER OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - SENTENCING DATE: Jun 2 2022 1:30PM JUDGE: CURLEY, ROCHELLE LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOCKE, RETLEY