This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/18/2022 at 21:00:18 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SAMS, OVERTON J

Case Summary

On 05/15/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SAMS, OVERTON J. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SAMS, OVERTON J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARGENT, KRISTINA

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

PROFFITT, GEOFFREY HARRISON

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

5/16/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SSO 22-41239

5/16/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SSO 22-41239

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

5/16/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

5/16/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

5/16/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

5/16/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

5/18/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 6/14/22)

6/13/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 6/14/22)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 6/14/22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT SSO 22-41239

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 06/24/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A , JDG: CURLEY, ROCHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROFFITT, GEOFFREY HARRISON