This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 05/04/2022 at 21:06:57 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SALAMANCA, ALEXJANDRO

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SALAMANCA, ALEXJANDRO. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SALAMANCA, ALEXJANDRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEGEL, REBECCA

Defendant Attorneys

PROFFITT, GEOFFREY HARRISON

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

RIER, ANDREW FRANKLIN

 

Court Documents

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 22-15790

3/30/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 22-15790

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

3/30/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

3/30/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

ADVISORY HEARING CONTINUANCE

3/30/2022: ADVISORY HEARING CONTINUANCE

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

3/30/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

3/31/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

3/31/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

3/31/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

4/1/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

4/7/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

4/7/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

4/7/2022: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

4/19/2022: MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

INFORMATION

4/21/2022: INFORMATION

INFORMATION - AMENDED (PAPER VERSION FILED 04/28/2022)

4/28/2022: INFORMATION - AMENDED (PAPER VERSION FILED 04/28/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION - AMENDED (PAPER VERSION FILED 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 22-15790

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIER, ANDREW FRANKLIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PROFFITT, GEOFFREY HARRISON