This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/27/2022 at 21:07:36 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SALAMANCA, ALEXJANDRO

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SALAMANCA, ALEXJANDRO. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SALAMANCA, ALEXJANDRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

LOCKE, RETLEY

PUBLIC DEFENDER

RIER, ANDREW FRANKLIN

RUHL, RICHARD

PROFFITT, GEOFFREY HARRISON

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

3/23/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

3/23/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

3/23/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

3/23/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

3/23/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

3/23/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

3/24/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

3/28/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANTS NOTCE OF DISCOVERY; REQUEST TO INSPECT; DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY; WITNESS LIST; DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DISCLOSURE TO PROSECUTION

3/28/2022: DEFENDANTS NOTCE OF DISCOVERY; REQUEST TO INSPECT; DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY; WITNESS LIST; DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DISCLOSURE TO PROSECUTION

APPLICATION FOR INFOMATION AND/OR COPY OF CHARGING DOCUMENT AND/OR INDICTMENT

3/28/2022: APPLICATION FOR INFOMATION AND/OR COPY OF CHARGING DOCUMENT AND/OR INDICTMENT

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

3/29/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

4/1/2022: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

4/18/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

4/18/2022: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

4/19/2022: MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR INFOMATION AND/OR COPY OF CHARGING DOCUMENT AND/OR INDICTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS NOTCE OF DISCOVERY; REQUEST TO INSPECT; DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY; WITNESS LIST; DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DISCLOSURE TO PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIER, ANDREW FRANKLIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUHL, RICHARD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOCKE, RETLEY