This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/17/2022 at 21:03:46 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS RUHL, KARL BRYAN

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RUHL, KARL BRYAN. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RUHL, KARL BRYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

VELASQUEZ, ROSEMARIE

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

1/14/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

1/14/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

1/14/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

1/14/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD # 22-002708

1/14/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD # 22-002708

DOMESTIC VIOLENCE SHEET

1/14/2022: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE SHEET

WITNESS STATEMENT

1/14/2022: WITNESS STATEMENT

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

1/14/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

1/14/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

BOND - PAPER # AS1K-571399

1/18/2022: BOND - PAPER # AS1K-571399

BOND - PAPER # AS1K-571400

1/18/2022: BOND - PAPER # AS1K-571400

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

1/18/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

1/19/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

MOTION TO MODIFY NO CONTACT ORDER

1/25/2022: MOTION TO MODIFY NO CONTACT ORDER

NOTICE OF HEARING

1/25/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

APPEARANCE RECORD

2/2/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • HearingTime:10:15 AM; Location:COURTROOM ZOOM; Description:CRIMINAL - MOTION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - MOTION HEARING DATE: Feb 2 2022 10:15AM JUDGE: CURLEY, ROCHELLE LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO MODIFY NO CONTACT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER # AS1K-571400

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER # AS1K-571399

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF000502NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD # 22-002708

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VELASQUEZ, ROSEMARIE