Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 17:04:24 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS ROUTH, MARK CHRISTIAN

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROUTH, MARK CHRISTIAN. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MOSS, DANA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Sarasota County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MOSS, DANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ROUTH, MARK CHRISTIAN

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND PAY

4/5/2021: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND PAY

ORDER TO APPEAR AND PAY - IMMEDIATE JAIL INCARCERATION ORDERED

4/5/2021: ORDER TO APPEAR AND PAY - IMMEDIATE JAIL INCARCERATION ORDERED

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD #21-17842

4/2/2021: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD #21-17842

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

4/2/2021: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING DISPOSITION

4/2/2021: ADVISORY HEARING DISPOSITION

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

4/2/2021: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

4/2/2021: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 2A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR ;Court Result:CANC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND PAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPEAR AND PAY - IMMEDIATE JAIL INCARCERATION ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$273.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$273.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD #21-17842

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant