This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/05/2022 at 21:00:44 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS ROMAN, JORDAN

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROMAN, JORDAN. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ROMAN, JORDAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELIX, DAVID

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

GILMAN, MARC

 

Court Documents

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-55267

7/1/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-55267

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

7/1/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

7/1/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

7/1/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

7/1/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

7/1/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

7/1/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

7/6/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

7/6/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

NOTICE OF CASE ACTION

7/19/2022: NOTICE OF CASE ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY; Court Result: CANC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-55267

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILMAN, MARC