Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 01/06/2021 at 15:04:39 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS RICHERSON, STEVEN B Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RICHERSON, STEVEN B. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERTS, CHARLES E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERTS, CHARLES E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

RICHERSON, STEVEN B

RICHERSON, STEVEN BARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANSICKLE, ANDREW

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

RUHL, MARIA

VARELA, KAREN L

XINIDIS, MARIA

HUSKISSON, LORI

TAYLOR, DAVID

EHLERS, DAVID RICHARD

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

8/16/2017: ORDER GRANTING PUBLIC DEFENDER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND APPOINTING OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

AFFIDAVIT VIOLATION OF PROBATION

8/14/2017: AFFIDAVIT VIOLATION OF PROBATION

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL-AMENDED

8/8/2017: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL-AMENDED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ANDWRITTEN DENIAL

6/13/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ANDWRITTEN DENIAL

ORDER - ADJUDICATION GUILTY PLACING ON PROBATION

4/18/2017: ORDER - ADJUDICATION GUILTY PLACING ON PROBATION

APPEARANCE RECORD DISPOSITION WITH A BOND

3/23/2017: APPEARANCE RECORD DISPOSITION WITH A BOND

NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - INFO

3/22/2017: NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - INFO

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

3/6/2017: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

2/27/2017: INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

PRO SE MOTION

10/30/2017: PRO SE MOTION

PLEA DENYING OR NOT GUILTY

8/10/2017: PLEA DENYING OR NOT GUILTY

ORDER - CHARGE/COST/FEES

7/14/2017: ORDER - CHARGE/COST/FEES

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

6/23/2017: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

6/12/2017: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADDENDUM VIOLATION OF PROBATION REPORT

5/18/2017: ADDENDUM VIOLATION OF PROBATION REPORT

SCORESHEET

3/23/2017: SCORESHEET

MOTION FOR BOND R EDUCTION

3/8/2017: MOTION FOR BOND R EDUCTION

DOMESTIC VIOLENCE SHEET

2/27/2017: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE SHEET

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketCASE SENT TO COLLECTIONS AGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketCASE SENT TO COLLECTIONS AGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - COST - PAY PLAN - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019080824)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - COST - PAY PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAY PLAN NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND PAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CORRECT JAIL SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketACTION: MOTION EMAILED TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED AND/OR MOTION FOR CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION FOR MODIFICATION; ORDER DISMISSING MOTION FOR CORRECTION OF JAIL CREDIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVICTIM NOTICE CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOMESTIC VIOLENCE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD #17-02-1269

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VANSICKLE, ANDREW