This case was last updated from Sarasota County Courts on 08/05/2022 at 21:06:02 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS REYES RAMIREZ, MELECIO

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against REYES RAMIREZ, MELECIO. This case was filed in Sarasota County Courts, Sarasota County Courthouse - Venice Branch located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GALEN, PHYLLIS R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 SC

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GALEN, PHYLLIS R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

REYES RAMIREZ, MELECIO

 

Court Documents

AMENDED NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

7/1/2022: AMENDED NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

7/1/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

CITATION - A3DQGOP

7/1/2022: CITATION - A3DQGOP

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD#22-037371

7/1/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD#22-037371

CITATION # A3DQGOP

7/1/2022: CITATION # A3DQGOP

CASH 9076558A POSTED $120.00

7/5/2022: CASH 9076558A POSTED $120.00

BOND - CASH NO 9076558A

7/5/2022: BOND - CASH NO 9076558A

APPEARANCE RECORD DISPOSITION WITH A BOND

7/28/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD DISPOSITION WITH A BOND

PAYMENT $253.00 RECEIPT #2022066681

7/28/2022: PAYMENT $253.00 RECEIPT #2022066681

PLEA

7/28/2022: PLEA

ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND PROMISE TO APPEAR

7/28/2022: ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND PROMISE TO APPEAR

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - A3DQGOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketCITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - A3DQGOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - A3DQGOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - A3DQGOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT AND PROMISE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $253.00 RECEIPT #2022066681

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD DISPOSITION WITH A BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $120.00 RECEIPT #2022066675 FROM CASH BOND #9076558A

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: CRIME STOPPERS-TRAFFIC (F.S. 938.06); Total Fee: $20.00; Amount Paid: $20.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: LOCAL LAW ENFC EDU TRUST (F.S. 938.15 and CTY ORD 81-127); Total Fee: $2.00; Amount Paid: $2.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketADD SENT TO TCATS - A3DQGOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION # A3DQGOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - NPPD#22-037371

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION - A3DQGOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENTS MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 07/28/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN A , JDG: GALEN, PHYLLIS R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant