Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 07/16/2021 at 21:00:56 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS PETE, RYAN ANDREW

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PETE, RYAN ANDREW. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PETE, RYAN ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

REISINGER, ERIC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOF JURY TRIAL, REQUEST FOR INFORMATION, CHARGING DOCUMENT AND/OR INDICTMENT, DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DISCOVERY, REQUEST TO INSPECT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

7/14/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOF JURY TRIAL, REQUEST FOR INFORMATION, CHARGING DOCUMENT AND/OR INDICTMENT, DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DISCOVERY, REQUEST TO INSPECT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

6/15/2021: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

BOND - PAPER POWER #AB21152344

6/14/2021: BOND - PAPER POWER #AB21152344

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

6/11/2021: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD #21-31208

6/11/2021: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD #21-31208

ARREST WARRANT EXECUTED

6/11/2021: ARREST WARRANT EXECUTED

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

6/11/2021: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOF JURY TRIAL, REQUEST FOR INFORMATION, CHARGING DOCUMENT AND/OR INDICTMENT, DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DISCOVERY, REQUEST TO INSPECT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER #AB21152344

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD #21-31208

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST WARRANT EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 07/23/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A , JDG: CURLEY, ROCHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REISINGER, ERIC