This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/12/2022 at 01:18:07 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS PERKINS, SHYHEM JARDALE

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PERKINS, SHYHEM JARDALE. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PERKINS, SHYHEM JARDALE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENE, JORDAN

Defendant Attorneys

LOCKE, RETLEY

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-79920

9/22/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-79920

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

9/22/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

9/22/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

9/22/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

9/22/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

9/22/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PLEA DENYING OR NOT GUILTY - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

9/23/2022: PLEA DENYING OR NOT GUILTY - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

9/30/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

DEFENDANT'S MOTION OT MODIFY BAIL

10/4/2022: DEFENDANT'S MOTION OT MODIFY BAIL

NOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

10/31/2022: NOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 11/1/22)

10/31/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 11/1/22)

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/31/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

APPEARANCE RECORD

11/4/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

11/4/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

11/4/2022: ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

ORDER -SETTING BOND

11/4/2022: ORDER -SETTING BOND

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3B; Description: CRIMINAL - CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:30 AM; Location: COURTROOM ZOOM; Description: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingTime: 11:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM ZOOM; Description: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketACTION: EMAILED ORDER ON BONDS TO SSO BOOKING COURTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER -SETTING BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 01/03/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN 3B , JDG: CURLEY, ROCHELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING DATE: Dec 12 2022 9:30AM JUDGE: CURLEY, ROCHELLE LOCATION: JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION OT MODIFY BAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA DENYING OR NOT GUILTY - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-79920

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOCKE, RETLEY