This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/31/2022 at 21:00:57 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS PATE, JASMINE SHALON

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PATE, JASMINE SHALON. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PATE, JASMINE SHALON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENE, JORDAN

Defendant Attorneys

VELASQUEZ, ROSEMARIE

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

7/27/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD#22-40004

7/27/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD#22-40004

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

7/27/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

7/27/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

7/27/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

7/27/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

7/29/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

SUGGESTION THAT DEFENDANT IS INCOMPETENT TO PROCEED

8/8/2022: SUGGESTION THAT DEFENDANT IS INCOMPETENT TO PROCEED

ORDER APPOINTING EXPERT

8/11/2022: ORDER APPOINTING EXPERT

MOTION FOR RELEASE OF UNCHARGED DEFENDANT

8/29/2022: MOTION FOR RELEASE OF UNCHARGED DEFENDANT

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 8/30/22)

8/29/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 8/30/22)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • HearingTime: 11:30 AM; Location: COURTROOM ZOOM; Description: CRIMINAL - MOTION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 8/30/22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR RELEASE OF UNCHARGED DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING EXPERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - MOTION HEARING DATE: Sep 20 2022 11:30AM JUDGE: CURLEY, ROCHELLE LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUGGESTION THAT DEFENDANT IS INCOMPETENT TO PROCEED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD#22-40004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VELASQUEZ, ROSEMARIE