This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/06/2022 at 01:09:22 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS PARRINELLO, PAUL EUGENE

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PARRINELLO, PAUL EUGENE. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PARRINELLO, PAUL EUGENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENE, JORDAN

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

LOCKE, RETLEY

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

9/19/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-79104

9/19/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-79104

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

9/19/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

9/19/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

9/19/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

9/19/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PLEA DENYING OR NOT GUILTY - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

9/21/2022: PLEA DENYING OR NOT GUILTY - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY - INCOMPLETE

9/22/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY - INCOMPLETE

CORRESPONDENCE

10/1/2022: CORRESPONDENCE

RECEIPT REVIEW AND ACTION TAKEN RE CORRESPONDENCE

10/12/2022: RECEIPT REVIEW AND ACTION TAKEN RE CORRESPONDENCE

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 10/13/2022)

10/12/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 10/13/2022)

MOTION - TO MODIFY BAIL

10/14/2022: MOTION - TO MODIFY BAIL

CORRESPONDENCE

10/18/2022: CORRESPONDENCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/31/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

11/4/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

11/4/2022: ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3B; Description: CRIMINAL - CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:30 AM; Location: COURTROOM ZOOM; Description: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • HearingTime: 02:15 PM; Location: COURTROOM ZOOM; Description: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 01/03/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN 3B , JDG: CURLEY, ROCHELLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING DATE: Nov 15 2022 2:15PM JUDGE: CURLEY, ROCHELLE LOCATION: JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING DATE: Dec 12 2022 9:30AM JUDGE: CURLEY, ROCHELLE LOCATION: JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2022
  • DocketACTION: EMAILED CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE CURLEY'S JA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY - INCOMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA DENYING OR NOT GUILTY - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-79104

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOCKE, RETLEY