This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/31/2022 at 21:00:52 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS ORDONEZCASTILLA, ESSAU WILMER

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ORDONEZCASTILLA, ESSAU WILMER. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are PADAR, DONNA and KRUG, THOMAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

PADAR, DONNA

KRUG, THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ORDONEZCASTILLA, WILMER ESAU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEAF, MEGAN

Defendant Attorneys

PASQUALI, JAMIE

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

7/27/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-63209

7/27/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-63209

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

7/27/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

7/27/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

7/27/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

7/27/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

7/28/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

BOND - PAPER POWER NO AA22-768171

7/28/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO AA22-768171

BOND - PAPER POWER NO AA22-768170

7/28/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO AA22-768170

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

7/29/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

NOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

8/16/2022: NOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED ON 8/17/22)

8/16/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED ON 8/17/22)

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

8/18/2022: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED ON 8/17/22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO AA22-768170

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO AA22-768171

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-63209

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PASQUALI, JAMIE