This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 10/19/2020 at 18:02:01 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS ORBEABECERRA, ALEJANDRA

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ORBEABECERRA, ALEJANDRA. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RIVA, DEBRA JOHNES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RIVA, DEBRA JOHNES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ORBEABECERRA, ALEJANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEAF, MEGAN

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

WILLIAMS, TAMARA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

10/19/2020: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

10/1/2020: INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

9/30/2020: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

9/25/2020: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

9/25/2020: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

9/25/2020: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #20-75438

9/25/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #20-75438

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

9/25/2020: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY ;Court Result:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee:$50.00; Amount Paid:$0.00; Waived Amount:$0.00; Amount Outstanding:$50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #20-75438

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 11/06/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A , JDG: PADAR, DONNA

    Read MoreRead Less