This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/20/2020 at 18:05:33 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS MULDOON, CONNER E

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MULDOON, CONNER E. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RIVA, DEBRA JOHNES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RIVA, DEBRA JOHNES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

MULDOON, CONNER E

MULDOON, CONNOR EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

POOLE, KENNETH

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY

1/29/2020: NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

1/29/2020: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

1/29/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

WITNESS STATEMENT

1/27/2020: WITNESS STATEMENT

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

1/27/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

1/28/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

COPY OF VALID FLORIDA DRIVERS LICENSE

1/27/2020: COPY OF VALID FLORIDA DRIVERS LICENSE

VEHICLE TOW AND STORAGE RECEIPT

1/27/2020: VEHICLE TOW AND STORAGE RECEIPT

AFFIDAVIT - BREATHALYZER

1/27/2020: AFFIDAVIT - BREATHALYZER

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

1/27/2020: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

CITATION #ACQL4FE

1/27/2020: CITATION #ACQL4FE

CITATION #AC8UDPE

1/27/2020: CITATION #AC8UDPE

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

1/27/2020: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

BOND - PAPER - POWER #AA20-616168

1/27/2020: BOND - PAPER - POWER #AA20-616168

BOND - PAPER - POWER #AA20-616167

1/27/2020: BOND - PAPER - POWER #AA20-616167

BOND - PAPER - POWER #AA20-616165

1/27/2020: BOND - PAPER - POWER #AA20-616165

DECISION TO DECLINE TO APPLY FOR THE SERVICES OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

1/27/2020: DECISION TO DECLINE TO APPLY FOR THE SERVICES OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketADD SENT TO TCATS - ACQL4FE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketADD SENT TO TCATS - AC8UDPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF VALID FLORIDA DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVEHICLE TOW AND STORAGE RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - BREATHALYZER

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION #ACQL4FE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION #AC8UDPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER - POWER #AA20-616168

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER - POWER #AA20-616167

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER - POWER #AA20-616165

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION TO DECLINE TO APPLY FOR THE SERVICES OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less