Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 07/16/2021 at 21:00:18 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS MOSER, CHASAITY SUE

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MOSER, CHASAITY SUE. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KRUG, THOMAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KRUG, THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MOSER, CHASAITY SUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUNN, STEPHEN

Defendant Attorney

GISH, MATTHEW CHANNELL

 

Court Documents

MAIL RETURNED

7/15/2021: MAIL RETURNED

NOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION/DECLINE

7/1/2021: NOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION/DECLINE

INFORMATION

7/1/2021: INFORMATION

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

7/1/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

6/14/2021: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

6/14/2021: PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

6/11/2021: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

6/11/2021: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

6/11/2021: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #21-49019

6/11/2021: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #21-49019

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

6/11/2021: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION/DECLINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2021CF006339NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2021CF006339NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2021CF006339NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2021CF006339NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2021CF006339NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO #21-49019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GISH, MATTHEW CHANNELL