This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/29/2022 at 21:02:33 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS MASALKO, ERIC SCOTT

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MASALKO, ERIC SCOTT. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KRUG, THOMAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KRUG, THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MASALKO, ERIC SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

GISH, MATTHEW CHANNELL

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

6/24/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT NPPD 22-035959

6/24/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT NPPD 22-035959

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

6/24/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

6/24/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

6/24/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

6/28/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

BOND - PAPER POWER NO. AS3K-513620

6/28/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO. AS3K-513620

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

6/29/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

APPEARANCE RECORD

7/29/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO. AS3K-513620

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF006928NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT NPPD 22-035959

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GISH, MATTHEW CHANNELL